Senate | 05/24/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Roberts | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Wolfley | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Coauthored by Representative McDugle | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Second Reading referred to Rules Committee then to Finance Committee | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Waldron | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 7 | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) ODonnell | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative McCall |