Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1967 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 27, 2023

Amended

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill February 17, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 15, 2023