Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 25
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Schreiber, Hefner, Dollens, Hilbert, Bennett, Townley
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Authored by Senator Matthews (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis, Menz, Martinez
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Nichols
|
|
|