28 | | - | ENGROSSED HOUSE |
---|
29 | | - | BILL NO. 2040 By: Nichols, Davis, Menz, |
---|
30 | | - | Martinez, Schreiber, |
---|
31 | | - | Hefner, Dollens, Hilbert, |
---|
32 | | - | Bennett, and Townley of the |
---|
33 | | - | House |
---|
| 29 | + | HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES - FLOOR VERSION |
---|
| 30 | + | |
---|
| 31 | + | STATE OF OKLAHOMA |
---|
| 32 | + | |
---|
| 33 | + | 1st Session of the 59th Legislature (2023) |
---|
| 34 | + | |
---|
| 35 | + | HOUSE BILL 2040 By: Nichols, Davis, Menz, and |
---|
| 36 | + | Martinez of the House |
---|
42 | | - | An Act relating to revenue and taxation; a mending |
---|
43 | | - | 68 O.S. 2021, Section 2357.403, as amended by |
---|
44 | | - | Section 1, Chapter 139, O.S .L. 2022 (68 O.S. Supp. |
---|
45 | | - | 2022, Section 2357.403), which relate s to |
---|
46 | | - | affordable housing tax credits; increasing amount |
---|
47 | | - | of tax credits; making tax credit nonrefundable; |
---|
48 | | - | and providing an effective date. |
---|
| 45 | + | AS INTRODUCED |
---|
| 46 | + | |
---|
| 47 | + | An Act relating to revenue and taxation; a mending 68 |
---|
| 48 | + | O.S. 2021, Section 2357.403, as amended by Section 1, |
---|
| 49 | + | Chapter 139, O.S.L. 2022 (68 O.S. Supp. 2022, Section |
---|
| 50 | + | 2357.403), which relate s to affordable housing tax |
---|
| 51 | + | credits; increasing amount of tax credits; and |
---|
| 52 | + | providing an effective date. |
---|
| 53 | + | |
---|
49 | 54 | | |
---|
50 | 55 | | |
---|
51 | 56 | | |
---|
52 | 57 | | |
---|
53 | 58 | | |
---|
54 | 59 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: |
---|
55 | 60 | | SECTION 1. AMENDATORY 68 O.S. 2021, Section 2357.403, as |
---|
56 | 61 | | amended by Section 1, Chapter 139, O.S.L. 2022 (68 O.S. Supp. 2022, |
---|
57 | 62 | | Section 2357.403), is amen ded to read as follows: |
---|
58 | 63 | | Section 2357.403 A. This act shall be known and may be cited |
---|
59 | 64 | | as the "Oklahoma Affordable H ousing Act". |
---|
60 | 65 | | B. As used in this section: |
---|
61 | 66 | | 1. "Allocation year" means the year for which the Oklahoma |
---|
62 | 67 | | Housing Finance Agency all ocates credits pursuant to this section; |
---|
91 | 97 | | given project qualifies for the Oklahoma Affordable Housing Tax |
---|
92 | 98 | | Credit authorized by this section. The Oklahoma Housing Finance |
---|
93 | 99 | | Agency, under Title 330, Oklahoma Housing Finance Agency, Chapter |
---|
94 | 100 | | 36, Affordable Housing Tax Credit Program Rules, shall promulgate |
---|
95 | 101 | | rules establishing criteri a upon which the eligibility statements |
---|
96 | 102 | | will be issued. The eligibility statement shall specify the amount |
---|
97 | 103 | | of Oklahoma Affordable Housing T ax Credits allocated to a qualified |
---|
98 | 104 | | project. The Oklahoma Housing Finance Agency shall only authorize |
---|
99 | 105 | | the tax credits created by this section to qualified projects which |
---|
100 | 106 | | are placed in service after July 1, 2015, but which shall not be |
---|
101 | 107 | | used to reduce tax l iability accruing prior to January 1, 2016; |
---|
102 | 108 | | 3. "Federal low-income housing tax credit" means the federal |
---|
103 | 109 | | tax credit as provided in Section 42 of the Internal Revenue Code o f |
---|
104 | 110 | | 1986, as amended; |
---|
105 | 111 | | 4. "Oklahoma Affordable Housing Tax Credit " means the tax |
---|
106 | 112 | | credit created by this section; |
---|
107 | 113 | | 5. "Qualified project" means a qualified low-income building as |
---|
108 | 114 | | that term is defined in Section 42 of the Internal Revenue Code of |
---|
109 | 115 | | 1986, as amended; and |
---|
110 | 116 | | 6. "Taxpayer" means a person, firm or corporation subject to |
---|
111 | 117 | | the tax imposed by Section 2355 of this title or an insuran ce |
---|
112 | 118 | | company subject to the tax imposed by Section 624 or 628 of Title 36 |
---|
147 | | - | Dollars ($4,000,000.00) Ten Million Dollars ($10,000,000.00 ) until |
---|
148 | | - | December 31, 2027, and Four Mil lion Dollars ($4,000,000.00) until |
---|
149 | | - | December 31, 2033. For purposes of this section, the "credit |
---|
150 | | - | period" shall mean the period of ten (10) taxab le years and "placed |
---|
151 | | - | in service" shall have the same meaning as is app licable under the |
---|
152 | | - | federal credit program. |
---|
| 154 | + | Dollars ($4,000,000.00) Ten Million Dollars ($10,000,000.00) . For |
---|
| 155 | + | purposes of this section, the "credit period" shall mean the period |
---|
| 156 | + | of ten (10) taxable years and "placed in service" shall have the |
---|
| 157 | + | same meaning as is app licable under the federal credit program. |
---|
153 | 158 | | D. A taxpayer owning an interest in an investment in a |
---|
154 | 159 | | qualified project shall be allowed Oklahoma Affordable Housing Tax |
---|
155 | 160 | | Credits under this se ction for tax years beginning on or after |
---|
156 | 161 | | January 1, 2016, if the Okla homa Housing Finance Agency issues an |
---|
157 | 162 | | eligibility statement for such project, which tax credit shall be |
---|
158 | 163 | | allocated among some or all of the partners, members or shareholders |
---|
159 | 164 | | of the taxpayer owning such interest in any m anner agreed to by such |
---|
160 | 165 | | partners, members or shareholders. Such taxpayer may assign i ts |
---|
192 | 197 | | pay any additional retaliato ry tax under Section 628 of Title 36 of |
---|
193 | 198 | | the Oklahoma Statutes as a result of claiming the credit. The |
---|
194 | 199 | | credit may fully offset any retalia tory tax imposed by Section 628 |
---|
195 | 200 | | of Title 36 of the Oklahoma Statutes. |
---|
196 | 201 | | F. The credit authorized by this section shall not be used to |
---|
197 | 202 | | reduce the tax liability of the taxpayer to less t han zero ($0.00). |
---|
198 | 203 | | G. Any credit claimed but not used in a taxable year m ay be |
---|
199 | 204 | | carried forward two (2) su bsequent taxable years. |
---|
200 | 205 | | H. The owner of a qualified project eligible for the credit |
---|
201 | 206 | | authorized by this section shall submit, at the time of filing the |
---|
202 | 207 | | tax return with the Oklahoma Tax Commission, an eligibility |
---|
203 | 208 | | statement from the Oklahoma Housing Finance Agency. In the case of |
---|
204 | 209 | | failure to attach the eligibility statement, no credit under t his |
---|
205 | 210 | | section shall be allowed with respect to such project for tha t year |
---|
206 | 211 | | until required documents are provided to the Tax Commission. |
---|
207 | 212 | | I. If under Section 42 of the Intern al Revenue Code of 1986, as |
---|
208 | 213 | | amended, a portion of any federal low -income housing credi ts taken |
---|
209 | 214 | | on a qualified project is required to be recaptured duri ng the first |
---|
210 | 215 | | ten (10) years after a project is placed in service, the tax payer |
---|
211 | 216 | | claiming Oklahoma Affordab le Housing Tax Credits with respect to |
---|
212 | 217 | | such project shall also be required to recaptur e a portion of such |
---|
213 | 218 | | credits. The amount of Oklahoma Affordable H ousing Tax Credits |
---|
242 | 248 | | J. The Oklahoma Housing Finance Agency or the Oklahoma Tax |
---|
243 | 249 | | Commission may require the filing of additional docu mentation |
---|
244 | 250 | | necessary to determine the accuracy of a tax credit claimed. |
---|
245 | 251 | | K. The Oklahoma Affordable Housin g Act shall undergo a review |
---|
246 | 252 | | every five (5) years by a committee of nine (9) persons, to be |
---|
247 | 253 | | appointed three persons each by the Governor, President Pr o Tempore |
---|
248 | 254 | | of the Senate, and the Speaker of the House of Representatives. |
---|
249 | 255 | | SECTION 2. This act shall become effective January 1, 2024. |
---|