Senate | 04/11/2023 | Emergency added | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 17 | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Amended | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Wolfley | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Elections and Ethics Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Elections and Ethics | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Roberts |