Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Remove as author Senator Bergstrom; authored by Senator Weaver
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Rick), Conley, Newton, Cornwell, Maynard, West (Kevin), Lawson, Grego, McEntire, Townley, Osburn, Sims, Worthen, Wolfley, Moore, Boatman, Lowe (Dick), Roberts, Bashore
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle, Boles, Cantrell, Dobrinski, Burns, Ford, Sterling, Stark
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Hardin
|
|
|