Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Wolfley
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Kendrix
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Authored by Senator Pemberton (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Ranson, Waldron, Fugate, Provenzano, McBride, West (Tammy)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Lowe (Dick)
|
|
|