Senate | 04/25/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Hill | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Placed on General Order | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Withdrawn from Appropriations committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Authored by Senator Thompson (Roger) (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Alonso-Sandoval | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Lowe (Dick) |