Senate | 04/18/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Hamilton | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Second Reading referred to Rules Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Jett | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 18 | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Amended by floor substitute | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Gann, Conley, Maynard | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Emergency added | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) CrosswhiteHader | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Olsen | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative West (Kevin) |