Senate | 04/03/2023 | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Affairs committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Affairs | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Authored by Senator Hall (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Burns |