Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2248 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 9, 2023

Amended

Bill April 4, 2023
Bill February 24, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 22, 2023