Senate | 04/11/2023 | Failed in Committee - Education | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Education | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 62 Nays: 20 | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Amended | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sims | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hilbert | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Burns |