Senate | 03/23/2023 | Second Reading referred to Education | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Coauthored by Representative West (Josh) | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 2 | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Authored by Senator Green (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | General Order | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Sterling |