House
|
05/01/2023
|
Approved by Governor 04/28/2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Placed on General Order
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Authored by Senator Rader (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Pfeiffer
|
|
|