Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2289 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 23, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 24, 2023

Amended

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill February 20, 2023