Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Amended by floor substitute | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Authored by Senator Garvin (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative May |