House
|
05/26/2023
|
Approved by Governor 06/07/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Conference granted, SCs named Paxton, McCortney, Daniels, Kidd, Haste, Rader
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
HC's named: Conference Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Naming of conferees rescinded
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Hill
|
|
|