Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2456 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 1, 2023
Bill March 21, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2023

Amended

Bill April 11, 2023
Bill March 4, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2023
Bill March 1, 2023