House
|
05/01/2023
|
Approved by Governor 04/28/2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Emergency passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Amendment restored bill to engrossed version
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Energy and Telecommunications committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Energy and Telecommunications Committee then to Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 10
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Authored by Senator Woods (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Energy and Natural Resources Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative ODonnell, McBride
|
|
|