Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 52 Nays: 35 | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Authored by Senator Howard (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Referred to Business and Commerce | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Withdrawn from Administrative Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative McBride |