Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Deck
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Alonso-Sandoval
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Talley
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Townley
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Pittman
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 6
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Tammy), Lowe (Dick), McBride, Waldron, Hasenbeck, Provenzano
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Common Education
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Baker
|
|
|