Senate | 04/04/2023 | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading referred to Education | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Staires | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Cantrell | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Pittman | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 3 | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Authored by Senator Stanley (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Tammy) | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Baker |