Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2684 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2023
Bill March 17, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 18, 2023

Amended

Bill April 17, 2023
Bill February 15, 2023