House
|
05/15/2023
|
Approved by Governor 05/15/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on General Order
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Authored by Senator Burns (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Waldron
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Remove Representative Hays as principal House author and substitute with Representative West (Rick)
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Withdrawn from Public Safety Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Hays
|
|
|