Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2686 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2023
Bill March 27, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 10, 2023

Amended

Bill April 20, 2023
Bill March 5, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill March 2, 2023