Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Conference granted, SCs named Stewart, Garvin, Hamilton, Rogers, Weaver, Bergstrom, Young
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Authored by Senator Stewart (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute County and Municipal Government Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Duel
|
|
|