Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2742 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 20, 2023
Bill March 22, 2023

Amended

Bill April 11, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 22, 2023