Senate | 04/03/2023 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Authored by Senator Stanley (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Miller |