House
|
05/25/2023
|
Filed with Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Veto override message received
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Measure returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Veto overridden: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Veto overridden: Ayes: 92 Nays: 5
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Vetoed 04/26/2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Amendment restored bill to engrossed version
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Affairs committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Affairs Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 2
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Moore
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Authored by Senator Kidd (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Wallace
|
|
|