Senate | 04/12/2023 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Wallace |