Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2864 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 28, 2023

Amended

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill February 20, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill February 20, 2023