Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HJR1017 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 23, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 24, 2023

Amended

Bill April 17, 2023
Bill March 5, 2023