Senate | 05/25/2023 | Reported Do Pass Administrative Rules committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules | ||
House | 05/22/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 05/22/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 05/22/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 64 Nays: 33 | ||
House | 05/22/2023 | Amended by floor substitute | ||
House | 05/22/2023 | Authored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 05/22/2023 | General Order | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) CrosswhiteHader | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | CR; Do Pass Administrative Rules Committee | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Authored by Representative Kendrix |