Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Approved by Governor 06/09/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 6
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Roe (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Thompson (Kristen)
|
|
|