Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1029 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 24, 2023
Bill March 7, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 22, 2023

Amended

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 13, 2023