Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Approved by Governor 06/07/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Deck
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Considered
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Laid over
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Withdrawn from Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Sneed (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Montgomery
|
|
|