House | 04/05/2023 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Stephens, Garvin | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Newhouse |