Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1070 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 23, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 5, 2023
Bill February 16, 2023

Amended

Bill April 5, 2023
Bill February 20, 2023