Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB11 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 1, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 1, 2023

Amended

Bill April 24, 2023
Bill February 16, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 20, 2023