Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Approved by Governor 05/25/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Pugh
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
JCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Second Reading, direct to Joint Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Pemberton
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Baker
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative McBride
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Newhouse
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Martinez
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Hall
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Authored by Senator Thompson (Roger)
|
|
|