House | 04/19/2023 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 5 | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 5 | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Ford (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Boren | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Thompson (Roger) |