Senate | 02/27/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Stephens | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Hamilton | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Burns | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Newhouse | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Standridge | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Rogers | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Finance Committee | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Prieto | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Bullard | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Pemberton | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Jett | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Murdock | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | First Reading |