Senate | 03/07/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Lepak (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Emergency added | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Bergstrom | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | First Reading |