Req. No. 344 Page 1 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 STATE OF OKLAHOMA 1st Session of the 59th Legislature (2023) SENATE BILL 2 By: Dahm AS INTRODUCED An Act relating to schools; requiring certain s chools and institutions of higher educati on to disseminate certain historic proclamations; pr oviding proclamations to be disseminated; providing for manner of dissemination; providing for codification; providing an effective date; and declaring an emergency. BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: SECTION 1. NEW LAW A new section of law to be codified in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 11-112 of Title 70, unless there is created a duplication in numb ering, reads as follows: A. Each school district, public charter school, virtual charter school, career and technology school , and institution of higher education within The Oklahoma State System of Higher Education shall disseminate historic proclamations regarding the Thanksgiving holiday. The proclamations shall include: 1. The Proclamation by the C ontinental Congress for a day of Thanksgiving on December 18, 1777; 2. The First Presidential Prayer Proclamation issued by George Washington for November 26, 1789; Req. No. 344 Page 2 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 3. The Thanksgiving Pro clamation issued by President Franklin D. Roosevelt for November 23, 1944; 4. The Thanksgiving Procl amation issued by Ronald Reagan for November 28, 1985; and 5. The Thanksgiving Proclamation issued by Mayor of Oklahoma City Sidney Clarke for No vember 28, 1889. B. The proclamations included in subsection A of this act may be disseminated to students in the following manner: 1. One proclamation may be read to students in the classroom or at a school assembly each of the five days leading up to Thanksgiving and prior to a school’s holiday break; 2. Proclamations may be printed and distributed to students each of the five days leading up to Thanksg iving and prior to a school’s holiday break; or 3. Proclamations may be emailed to students each of the five days leading up to Thanksgiving and prior to a school’s holiday break. SECTION 2. This act shall become effective July 1, 2023. SECTION 3. It being immediately necessary for the preservation of the public peace, health , or safety, an emergency is hereby declared to exist, by reason whereof this act shall take effect and be in full force from and after its passage and approval. 59-1-344 EB 11/23/2022 8:42:28 AM