Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB2 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 11/23/2022

                             
 
 
Req. No. 344 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 59th Legislature (2023) 
 
SENATE BILL 2 	By: Dahm 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
An Act relating to schools; requiring certain s chools 
and institutions of higher educati on to disseminate 
certain historic proclamations; pr oviding 
proclamations to be disseminated; providing for 
manner of dissemination; providing for codification; 
providing an effective date; and declaring an 
emergency. 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.    NEW LAW     A new section of law to be codified 
in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 11-112 of Title 70, unless there 
is created a duplication in numb ering, reads as follows: 
A.  Each school district, public charter school, virtual charter 
school, career and technology school , and institution of higher 
education within The Oklahoma State System of Higher Education shall 
disseminate historic proclamations regarding the Thanksgiving 
holiday. The proclamations shall include: 
1.  The Proclamation by the C ontinental Congress for a day of 
Thanksgiving on December 18, 1777; 
2.  The First Presidential Prayer Proclamation issued by George 
Washington for November 26, 1789;   
 
 
Req. No. 344 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
3.  The Thanksgiving Pro clamation issued by President Franklin 
D. Roosevelt for November 23, 1944; 
4.  The Thanksgiving Procl amation issued by Ronald Reagan for 
November 28, 1985; and 
5.  The Thanksgiving Proclamation issued by Mayor of Oklahoma 
City Sidney Clarke for No vember 28, 1889. 
B.  The proclamations included in subsection A of this act may 
be disseminated to students in the following manner: 
1.  One proclamation may be read to students in the classroom or 
at a school assembly each of the five days leading up to 
Thanksgiving and prior to a school’s holiday break; 
2.  Proclamations may be printed and distributed to students 
each of the five days leading up to Thanksg iving and prior to a 
school’s holiday break; or 
3.  Proclamations may be emailed to students each of the five 
days leading up to Thanksgiving and prior to a school’s holiday 
break. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective July 1, 2023. 
SECTION 3.  It being immediately necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health , or safety, an emergency is hereby 
declared to exist, by reason whereof this act shall take effect and 
be in full force from and after its passage and approval. 
 
59-1-344 EB 11/23/2022 8:42:28 AM