Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB2 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22
33
44 Req. No. 344 Page 1 1
55 2
66 3
77 4
88 5
99 6
1010 7
1111 8
1212 9
1313 10
1414 11
1515 12
1616 13
1717 14
1818 15
1919 16
2020 17
2121 18
2222 19
2323 20
2424 21
2525 22
2626 23
2727 24
2828 1
2929 2
3030 3
3131 4
3232 5
3333 6
3434 7
3535 8
3636 9
3737 10
3838 11
3939 12
4040 13
4141 14
4242 15
4343 16
4444 17
4545 18
4646 19
4747 20
4848 21
4949 22
5050 23
5151 24
5252
5353 STATE OF OKLAHOMA
5454
5555 1st Session of the 59th Legislature (2023)
5656
5757 SENATE BILL 2 By: Dahm
5858
5959
6060
6161 AS INTRODUCED
6262
6363 An Act relating to schools; requiring certain s chools
6464 and institutions of higher educati on to disseminate
6565 certain historic proclamations; pr oviding
6666 proclamations to be disseminated; providing for
6767 manner of dissemination; providing for codification;
6868 providing an effective date; and declaring an
6969 emergency.
7070
7171
7272
7373 BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA:
7474 SECTION 1. NEW LAW A new section of law to be codified
7575 in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 11-112 of Title 70, unless there
7676 is created a duplication in numb ering, reads as follows:
7777 A. Each school district, public charter school, virtual charter
7878 school, career and technology school , and institution of higher
7979 education within The Oklahoma State System of Higher Education shall
8080 disseminate historic proclamations regarding the Thanksgiving
8181 holiday. The proclamations shall include:
8282 1. The Proclamation by the C ontinental Congress for a day of
8383 Thanksgiving on December 18, 1777;
8484 2. The First Presidential Prayer Proclamation issued by George
8585 Washington for November 26, 1789;
8686
8787
8888 Req. No. 344 Page 2 1
8989 2
9090 3
9191 4
9292 5
9393 6
9494 7
9595 8
9696 9
9797 10
9898 11
9999 12
100100 13
101101 14
102102 15
103103 16
104104 17
105105 18
106106 19
107107 20
108108 21
109109 22
110110 23
111111 24
112112 1
113113 2
114114 3
115115 4
116116 5
117117 6
118118 7
119119 8
120120 9
121121 10
122122 11
123123 12
124124 13
125125 14
126126 15
127127 16
128128 17
129129 18
130130 19
131131 20
132132 21
133133 22
134134 23
135135 24
136136
137137 3. The Thanksgiving Pro clamation issued by President Franklin
138138 D. Roosevelt for November 23, 1944;
139139 4. The Thanksgiving Procl amation issued by Ronald Reagan for
140140 November 28, 1985; and
141141 5. The Thanksgiving Proclamation issued by Mayor of Oklahoma
142142 City Sidney Clarke for No vember 28, 1889.
143143 B. The proclamations included in subsection A of this act may
144144 be disseminated to students in the following manner:
145145 1. One proclamation may be read to students in the classroom or
146146 at a school assembly each of the five days leading up to
147147 Thanksgiving and prior to a school’s holiday break;
148148 2. Proclamations may be printed and distributed to students
149149 each of the five days leading up to Thanksg iving and prior to a
150150 school’s holiday break; or
151151 3. Proclamations may be emailed to students each of the five
152152 days leading up to Thanksgiving and prior to a school’s holiday
153153 break.
154154 SECTION 2. This act shall become effective July 1, 2023.
155155 SECTION 3. It being immediately necessary for the preservation
156156 of the public peace, health , or safety, an emergency is hereby
157157 declared to exist, by reason whereof this act shall take effect and
158158 be in full force from and after its passage and approval.
159159
160160 59-1-344 EB 11/23/2022 8:42:28 AM