House | 04/11/2023 | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Referred to Rules | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Withdrawn from Public Health Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Kendrix (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Bergstrom |