Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB230 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 9, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 27, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 27, 2023

Amended

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill February 13, 2023