Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Died in conference
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Conference granted, naming GCCA
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
SCs named Thompson (Roger), Garvin, Stewart, Young, Weaver, Bergstrom, Murdock
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 4
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 48 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Osburn (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Thompson (Roger)
|
|
|