Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB302 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 1, 2023
Bill March 9, 2023

Amended

Bill April 20, 2023
Bill March 2, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 23, 2023